U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00375
  • Case Name: Buckner v. Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Objection]
  • April 18, 2025: [Bill of Costs]
  • April 17, 2025: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 15, 2025: [USCA Appeal Fees]
  • April 15, 2025: [Deficiency]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Appeal]
  • April 04, 2025: [Recusal]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Judgment]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.