U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00163
  • Case Name: Garcia v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Order]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order]
  • April 03, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Corporate and/or Diversity Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1)]
  • March 28, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order - TEXT ONLY]
  • March 21, 2025: [Deficiency]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 21, 2025: [Case Assignment]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.