U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00166
  • Case Name: Berrytown Apartments Associates, Ltd. et al v. Nationwide Assurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 28, 2025: [Request for Fee Refund]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Corporate and/or Diversity Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1)]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order - TEXT ONLY]
  • April 18, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 17, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Corporate and/or Diversity Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1)]
  • March 25, 2025: [Corporate and/or Diversity Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1)]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 24, 2025: [Deficiency]
  • March 24, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • March 24, 2025: [Case Assignment]
  • March 24, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.