U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00172
  • Case Name: Ginter v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Proposed Agreed Order]
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 09, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • April 09, 2025: [Corporate and/or Diversity Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1)]
  • April 09, 2025: [Substitute Attorney]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Settlement]
  • March 27, 2025: [Deficiency]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 27, 2025: [Case Assignment]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.