U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-cv-00027
  • Case Name: Mathew v. Owensboro Health, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Response]
  • April 21, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • April 21, 2025: [Strike]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 14, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 09, 2025: [Telephone Conference]
  • April 09, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 07, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 04, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
  • April 01, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Expedite]
  • March 31, 2025: [Remand]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 28, 2025: [Corporate and/or Diversity Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1)]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
  • March 28, 2025: [Case Assignment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.