U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-cv-00031
  • Case Name: Newcomb et al v. Church et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 23, 2025: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • April 23, 2025: [Corporate and/or Diversity Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1)]
  • April 23, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order to Show Cause]
  • April 11, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • April 11, 2025: [Corporate and/or Diversity Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1)]
  • April 11, 2025: [Case Assignment]
  • April 11, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.