U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cr-00073-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Guerrero Vargas
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 23, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 23, 2025: [Interpreter Oath]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order Referring Motion - TEXT ONLY]
  • April 22, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 22, 2025: [Bond]
  • April 19, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 18, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 16, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 16, 2025: [Case Assignment]
  • April 16, 2025: [Sealed Document - Court User Only]
  • April 16, 2025: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.