U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-50612
  • Case Name: Everett J Bracken
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Creditor Request for Notices]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Serve Plan (Ch 12 or 13)]
  • April 26, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Debtor (Ch 13)]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 13]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.