U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10375
  • Case Name: Sean Richard Kelley
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Lawrence, -13 William W. [Creditor Request for Notices]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Lawrence, -13 William W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing ]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Lawrence, -13 William W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Debtor]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Lawrence, -13 William W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Lawrence, -13 William W. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Lawrence, -13 William W. [Generate 341 Notice-Chapter 13]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Lawrence, -13 William W. [Set 13 Certificate of Service Deadline]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Lawrence, -13 William W. [Hearing(Chapter 13 Confirmation Hearing-Initial)]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Lawrence, -13 William W. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 13]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Lawrence, -13 William W. [none]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [none]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) - Case Upload]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Statement of Social Security Number]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.