U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-20365-dll
  • Case Name: Heather Ann Mitilien
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Personal Financial Management Course]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Amended Schedules A-H, Mailing Matrix]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Notice]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Amend]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Debtor (Ch 13)]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 13]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Certificate of Service of Plan]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.