U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-60494
  • Case Name: Richard Wayne Stidham, Jr and Kansas Marie Stidham
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Creditor Request for Notices]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Pay Wages]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Proposed Order Submitted]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Notice]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Debtor (Ch 13)]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 13]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [RETIRED Statement of Social Security Number (Form 121)]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 [RETIRED Statement of Social Security Number (Form 121)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.