U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-50649
  • Case Name: Fred Mark Thompson, III and Rebecca Renee Thompson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Financial Management Course]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Personal Financial Management Course]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses and Charges]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Creditor Request for Notices]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Pay Wages]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Certification re Ch 13 Rights and Responsibilities]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Proposed Order Submitted]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Notice]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Debtor (Ch 13)]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 13]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Statement of Social Security Number (Form 121)]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 [Statement of Social Security Number (Form 121)]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition (fee) - case upload]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Voluntary Petition Chapter 13 Plan- case upload]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition (fee) - case upload]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition Chapter 13 Plan- case upload]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.