U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-50648
  • Case Name: Kierra Clark
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lyon, James D. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lyon, James D. [Payment of Fee for Cases filed AFTER Dec 1 2020 (Installment Payment)]
  • May 04, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lyon, James D. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lyon, James D. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lyon, James D. [Debtor (Ch 7)]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lyon, James D. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7 No Asset Individual]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lyon, James D. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lyon, James D. [RETIRED Statement of Social Security Number (Form 121)]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lyon, James D. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lyon, James D. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [RETIRED Statement of Social Security Number (Form 121)]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.