U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-30154
  • Case Name: Rebecca Long
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Westenhoefer, James R. [Financial Management Course]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Westenhoefer, James R. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Westenhoefer, James R. [Notice of Filing]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Westenhoefer, James R. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Westenhoefer, James R. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Westenhoefer, James R. [Amend]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Westenhoefer, James R. [3 DAY Order to Pay Filing Fee (Electronically Filed Documents ONLY)]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Westenhoefer, James R. [File (BNC)]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Westenhoefer, James R. [Debtor (Ch 7)]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Westenhoefer, James R. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7 No Asset Individual]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Westenhoefer, James R. [Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition (fee) - case upload]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition (fee) - case upload]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.