U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-20378-dll
  • Case Name: Jacob Allen Vincent and Christine Ann Vincent
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Pay Wages]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Adequate Protection Payments]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Proposed Order Submitted]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Certificate of Service of Plan]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Statement of Current Monthly Income - Ch 13]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Notice to Individual Consumer Debtor]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Disclosure of Fees by Attorney for Debtor]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Certification re Ch 13 Rights and Responsibilities]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Schedules]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Objection to Claim]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Creditor Request for Notices]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Notice]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Submit Chapter 13 Plan]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [File (BNC)]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Debtor (Ch 13)]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 13]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.