U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 15-20127
  • Case Name: Calvin LaFleur, Sr. and Deborah Lynn LaFleur
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
July, 2016
  • July 18, 2016: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Final Decree]
  • July 18, 2016: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • July 15, 2016: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Chapter 13 Trustees Final Report]
  • July 06, 2016: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Appearance and Request Notice]
June, 2016
  • June 10, 2016: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 08, 2016: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Trustees Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • June 03, 2016: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Hearing Held - Motion]
May, 2016
  • May 01, 2016: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [CHAP Hearing Continued - Other - Do Not Use]
  • April 29, 2016: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [CM/ECF Send PDF to BNC - EDITORS ONLY]
  • April 21, 2016: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Response]
  • April 05, 2016: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Dismiss Case by Trustee]
November, 2015
  • November 05, 2015: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges]
August, 2015
  • August 17, 2015: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Trustees Notice to Pay Claim(s)and Disallow Claim(s) - Batch]
June, 2015
  • June 29, 2015: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Hearing Held - Other]
February, 2015
  • February 23, 2015: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Information Regarding Prior Filings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.