U.S. Federal Court Records for the Middle District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 16-10829
  • Case Name: Ryan August Serpas, Sr.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 02, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Closing Chapter 13 Case]
  • December 02, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Certificate of Service]
  • December 02, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account (batch)]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Domestic Support Obligation Discharge Notice]
  • October 07, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • October 05, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Discharging Debtor 13 after plan completion - form]
April, 2021
  • April 20, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 20, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
May, 2020
  • May 12, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 12, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
June, 2019
  • June 19, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Notice of Change of Address]
  • June 10, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Certificate of Service]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 31, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
April, 2018
  • April 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order]
  • April 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Notice of Transfer of Claim]
  • April 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Transfer of Claim]
March, 2017
  • March 16, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Certificate of Service]
November, 2016
  • November 10, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order]
  • November 08, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
  • November 01, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [NOA Matters]
  • November 01, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Cases Ready for Confirmation - NOA]
October, 2016
  • October 20, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Certificate of Service]
  • October 20, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Debtor Verification of Direct Payments]
  • October 20, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
  • October 18, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Amended Schedules A/B, G, H, I, or J]
  • October 05, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order]
  • October 03, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Certificate of Service]
  • October 03, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Continue Hearing]
September, 2016
  • September 12, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Trustee Status Report (batch)]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Chapter 13 Proceeding Memo-Meeting of Creditors Held]
July, 2016
  • July 30, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • July 29, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Domestic Support Obligation Notice]
  • July 28, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Certificate of Service]
  • July 28, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • July 28, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Chapter 13 Calculation of Disposable Income 122C-2]
  • July 28, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Chapter 13 Statement of Monthly Income 122C-1]
  • July 28, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Summary of Your Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information]
  • July 28, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • July 28, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Schedules A/B-J]
  • July 28, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor ]
  • July 28, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • July 19, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Domestic Support Information]
  • July 19, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Payment Advices]
  • July 18, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • July 18, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • July 18, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • July 18, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • July 18, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • July 18, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.