U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-30996
  • Case Name: Kenneth Hathorn
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2018
  • April 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (Ch 13 Trustee) E. Eugene [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • April 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (Ch 13 Trustee) E. Eugene [Final Decree]
March, 2018
  • March 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (Ch 13 Trustee) E. Eugene [Chapter 13 Trustees Final Report]
December, 2017
  • December 02, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (Ch 13 Trustee) E. Eugene [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (Ch 13 Trustee) E. Eugene [Trustees Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • November 29, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (Ch 13 Trustee) E. Eugene [Dismiss Case by Trustee]
  • November 11, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (Ch 13 Trustee) E. Eugene [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 09, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (Ch 13 Trustee) E. Eugene [Trustees Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Dismiss]
  • November 09, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (Ch 13 Trustee) E. Eugene [Denying Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan]
October, 2017
  • October 18, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (Ch 13 Trustee) E. Eugene [Memorandum]
  • October 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (Ch 13 Trustee) E. Eugene [Dismiss Case by Trustee]
  • October 11, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (Ch 13 Trustee) E. Eugene [Objection]
  • October 11, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (Ch 13 Trustee) E. Eugene [Addendum to Chapter 13 Plan]
  • October 10, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (Ch 13 Trustee) E. Eugene [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor ]
September, 2017
  • September 30, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (Ch 13 Trustee) E. Eugene [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 28, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (Ch 13 Trustee) E. Eugene [Denying Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan]
  • September 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (Ch 13 Trustee) E. Eugene [Hearing - Minute Entry Held or Continued Re:]
  • September 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (Ch 13 Trustee) E. Eugene [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • September 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (Ch 13 Trustee) E. Eugene [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
August, 2017
  • August 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (Ch 13 Trustee) E. Eugene [First Meeting of Creditors Statement of Adjourning/Continuing]
  • August 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (Ch 13 Trustee) E. Eugene [First Meeting of Creditors Held Chapter 13 - No Exceptions]
July, 2017
  • July 23, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (Ch 13 Trustee) E. Eugene [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
  • July 23, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (Ch 13 Trustee) E. Eugene [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (Ch 13 Trustee) E. Eugene [CM/ECF ADI Notice of 341 and Confirmation - Do Not Use]
  • July 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (Ch 13 Trustee) E. Eugene [Confirmation Hearing Set - Chapter 13]
  • July 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (Ch 13 Trustee) E. Eugene [First Meeting of Creditors Set - Chapter 13 (Batch)]
  • July 18, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (Ch 13 Trustee) E. Eugene [Addendum to Chapter 13 Plan]
  • July 18, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (Ch 13 Trustee) E. Eugene [Chapter 13 Plan Summary Notice]
  • July 18, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (Ch 13 Trustee) E. Eugene [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • July 17, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (Ch 13 Trustee) E. Eugene [Declaration Re Electronic Filing - Statement of SSN]
  • July 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (Ch 13 Trustee) E. Eugene [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Deficient Filing(s)]
  • July 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (Ch 13 Trustee) E. Eugene [Employee Income Records]
  • July 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (Ch 13 Trustee) E. Eugene [Copy of Social Security Card - Photo ID]
  • July 12, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (Ch 13 Trustee) E. Eugene [Notice of Deficiency/Required Documents]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (Ch 13 Trustee) E. Eugene [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Deficient Filing(s)]
  • June 30, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (Ch 13 Trustee) E. Eugene [Declaration Re Electronic Filing - Statement of SSN]
  • June 30, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (Ch 13 Trustee) E. Eugene [Copy of Social Security Card - Photo ID]
  • June 30, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (Ch 13 Trustee) E. Eugene [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • June 28, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (Ch 13 Trustee) E. Eugene [Notice of Deficiency/Required Documents]
  • June 26, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (Ch 13 Trustee) E. Eugene [Set Deadlines on New Bankruptcy Case Chapter 7/13 Filed ECF]
  • June 26, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (Ch 13 Trustee) E. Eugene [Information Regarding Prior Filings]
  • June 25, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (Ch 13 Trustee) E. Eugene [Autodocket US Treasury Receipt]
  • June 25, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (Ch 13 Trustee) E. Eugene [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Fee)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.