Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Louisiana

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Louisiana
    Case Number:3:19-cr-00004-1
    Party Name:USA v. Stanton
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement Accepted]
    Date Published:March 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Referral to Probation for Pre-Sentence Investigation and Report]
    Date Published:March 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change of Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:March 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:March 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Minute Entry]
    Date Published:March 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed (Sealed Pleading)]
    Date Published:February 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling Order (Shreveport/Monroe)]
    Date Published:January 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:January 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Discovery]
    Date Published:January 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:January 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:January 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:January 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Plea Entered]
    Date Published:January 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Discovery]
    Date Published:January 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Public Defender]
    Date Published:January 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (Sealed Pleading)]
    Date Published:January 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Grand Jury Report]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Defendant Information Sheet (Sealed Pleading)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment With Signature (Sealed Pleading)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.lawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?166566
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 3 =