open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Louisiana

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Louisiana
    Case Number:3:18-cr-00162-1
    Party Name:USA v. Lachney
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Entry of Preliminary Order of Forfeiture]
    Date Published:April 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Entry of Preliminary Order of Forfeiture]
    Date Published:March 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Re-Arraignment]
    Date Published:March 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Plea Entered]
    Date Published:March 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling Order Setting Jury Trial]
    Date Published:February 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing ]
    Date Published:February 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:February 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Public Defender]
    Date Published:January 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention]
    Date Published:January 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:January 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Oral Order]
    Date Published:January 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:January 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.lamd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?55281
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 2 =