open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Louisiana

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Louisiana
    Case Number:6:00-cr-60036-1
    Party Name:USA v. Waln, et al
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Return of Service by U S Marshal]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Dismissal of Garnishment]
    Date Published:April 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Dismissal of Garnishment]
    Date Published:April 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Answer of Garnishee]
    Date Published:April 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Mail Returned]
    Date Published:April 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Writ of Continuing Garnishment Issued]
    Date Published:March 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Minute Entry/Order Reassigning Case]
    Date Published:March 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Application for Writ of Continuing Garnishment/Execution]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.lawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?60469
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 3 =