open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Louisiana

LOUISIANA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Louisiana
    Case Number:2:18-cv-07889
    Party Name:Ictech-Bendeck v. Waste Connections Bayou, Inc., et al.
  • Filing Type:Civil [Telephone Conference]
    Date Published:December 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:November 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record]
    Date Published:November 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Enroll as Counsel of Record]
    Date Published:November 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set Hearings]
    Date Published:November 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Protective Order]
    Date Published:November 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:October 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:October 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk]
    Date Published:October 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:October 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Conference]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.laed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?220808
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 3 =