open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Louisiana

LOUISIANA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Louisiana
    Case Number:2:19-cv-14223
    Party Name:Sivyer v. Sanofi US Services Inc. et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation and Order of Dismissal]
    Date Published:May 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:December 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Create Case Association]
    Date Published:December 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:December 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Case Assignment]
    Date Published:December 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.laed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?243463
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 1 =