open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Louisiana

LOUISIANA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Louisiana
    Case Number:2:20-cv-00533
    Party Name:Johnson v. Regions Bank et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:September 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:September 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Failure to State a Claim]
    Date Published:July 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Report]
    Date Published:June 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order of Recusal]
    Date Published:June 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Reassigning Case]
    Date Published:June 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Conference]
    Date Published:May 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Supplemental Memorandum]
    Date Published:May 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
    Date Published:May 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave to File Document]
    Date Published:May 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:May 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Remand]
    Date Published:May 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:May 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set Hearings]
    Date Published:May 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:May 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:April 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk]
    Date Published:April 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Remand]
    Date Published:April 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Setting/Resetting Hearing on Motion]
    Date Published:March 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Motions]
    Date Published:March 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record]
    Date Published:March 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:March 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Enroll as Counsel of Record]
    Date Published:March 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Statement of Corporate Disclosure]
    Date Published:February 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss/Failure to State a Claim/FRCP12(b)(6)]
    Date Published:February 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Case Assignment]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.laed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?244799
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 1 =