open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Louisiana

LOUISIANA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Louisiana
    Case Number:20-50520
    Party Name:Amanda Duplechain Bordelon
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Appearance and Request Notice]
    Date Published:July 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Wage Deduction]
    Date Published:July 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:July 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:July 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [CM/ECF ADI Notice of 341 and Confirmation - Do Not Use]
    Date Published:July 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Notice of Telephonic Meeting of Creditors (Batch)]
    Date Published:July 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Confirmation Hearing Set - Chapter 13 (Cases filed 12/1/17 and after)]
    Date Published:July 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [First Meeting of Creditors Set - Chapter 13 (Batch) (Cases filed 12/1/17 and after)]
    Date Published:July 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Autodocket US Treasury Receipt]
    Date Published:June 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:June 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor ]
    Date Published:June 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:June 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Declaration Re Electronic Filing - Statement of SSN (Rule 1007)]
    Date Published:June 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Copy of Social Security Card - Photo ID]
    Date Published:June 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Employee Income Records]
    Date Published:June 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:June 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Fee)]
    Date Published:June 30, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.lawb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?347014
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 2 =