open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Louisiana

LOUISIANA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Louisiana
    Case Number:20-11420
    Party Name:Alvin L James
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rivera-Fulton, Barbara [Memo to Record]
    Date Published:September 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rivera-Fulton, Barbara [Trustee's Disclaimer and Abandonment (Order)]
    Date Published:September 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rivera-Fulton, Barbara [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:August 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rivera-Fulton, Barbara [Set Hearing (Order) (AP) (BK)]
    Date Published:August 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rivera-Fulton, Barbara [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rivera-Fulton, Barbara [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rivera-Fulton, Barbara [Application to Have the Filing Fee Waived]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rivera-Fulton, Barbara [Payment Advices]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rivera-Fulton, Barbara [Certificate of Credit Counseling Db (PF)]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rivera-Fulton, Barbara [Social Security Statement - Private]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rivera-Fulton, Barbara [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1)/Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rivera-Fulton, Barbara [Schedule J]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rivera-Fulton, Barbara [Schedule I]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rivera-Fulton, Barbara [Schedule H]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rivera-Fulton, Barbara [Schedule G]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rivera-Fulton, Barbara [Schedule E/F]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rivera-Fulton, Barbara [Schedule D]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rivera-Fulton, Barbara [Schedule C]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rivera-Fulton, Barbara [Schedule A/B]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rivera-Fulton, Barbara [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.laeb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?196313
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 3 =