open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Louisiana

LOUISIANA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Louisiana
    Case Number:20-10744
    Party Name:Albert R. Smith and Elizabeth L. Smith
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Luster, John W. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
    Date Published:September 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Luster, John W. [First Meeting of Creditors Held Chapter 7 - No Exceptions]
    Date Published:September 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Luster, John W. [Amended or Supplement to Schedules I, J,J-2]
    Date Published:September 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Luster, John W. [Amended Voluntary Petition - All Chapters]
    Date Published:August 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Luster, John W. [Appearance and Request Notice]
    Date Published:August 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Luster, John W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:August 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Luster, John W. [First Meeting of Creditors and Discharge Issuance Set - Chapter 7]
    Date Published:August 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Luster, John W. [Employee Income Records]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Luster, John W. [Information Regarding Prior Filings]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Luster, John W. [Copy of Social Security Card - Photo ID]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Luster, John W. [Declaration Re Electronic Filing - Statement of SSN (Rule 1007)]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Luster, John W. [Autodocket US Treasury Receipt]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Luster, John W. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Fee)]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Luster, John W. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.lawb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?347418
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 2 =