open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Louisiana

LOUISIANA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Louisiana
    Case Number:20-50615
    Party Name:Joseph Louis Dore' and Sheila Hale Dore'
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
    Date Published:September 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [First Meeting of Creditors Held Chapter 13 - No Exceptions]
    Date Published:September 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Appearance and Request Notice]
    Date Published:August 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:August 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:August 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Wage Deduction]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [CM/ECF ADI Notice of 341 and Confirmation - Do Not Use]
    Date Published:August 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Notice of Telephonic Meeting of Creditors (Batch)]
    Date Published:August 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Confirmation Hearing Set - Chapter 13 (Cases filed 12/1/17 and after)]
    Date Published:August 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [First Meeting of Creditors Set - Chapter 13 (Batch) (Cases filed 12/1/17 and after)]
    Date Published:August 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Set Deadlines on New Bankruptcy Case Chapter 11/12 Filed ECF]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Information Regarding Prior Filings]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Autodocket US Treasury Receipt]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Declaration Re Electronic Filing - Statement of SSN (Rule 1007)]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Copy of Social Security Card - Photo ID]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Employee Income Records]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Voluntary Petition Chapter 13, All Schedules & Statements - case upload (Fee)]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor - caseupload]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.lawb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?347419
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 1 =