open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Louisiana

LOUISIANA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Louisiana
    Case Number:20-80475
    Party Name:Kelly Anne Johnson
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Thornburg, Jon C. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
    Date Published:September 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Thornburg, Jon C. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:September 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Thornburg, Jon C. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:September 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Thornburg, Jon C. [CM/ECF ADI Notice of 341 and Confirmation - Do Not Use]
    Date Published:September 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Thornburg, Jon C. [Confirmation Hearing Set - Chapter 13 (Cases filed 12/1/17 and after)]
    Date Published:September 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Thornburg, Jon C. [Notice of Telephonic Meeting of Creditors (Batch)]
    Date Published:September 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Thornburg, Jon C. [First Meeting of Creditors Set - Chapter 13 (Batch) (Cases filed 12/1/17 and after)]
    Date Published:September 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Thornburg, Jon C. [Appearance and Request Notice]
    Date Published:September 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Thornburg, Jon C. [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Thornburg, Jon C. [Declaration Re Electronic Filing - Statement of SSN (Rule 1007)]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Thornburg, Jon C. [Copy of Social Security Card - Photo ID]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Thornburg, Jon C. [Employee Income Records]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Thornburg, Jon C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Thornburg, Jon C. [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Thornburg, Jon C. [Autodocket US Treasury Receipt]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Thornburg, Jon C. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Fee)]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.lawb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?347787
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 2 =