open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Louisiana

LOUISIANA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Louisiana
    Case Number:20-10646
    Party Name:Tammy L. Crawford
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Expedite Hearing]
    Date Published:September 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:September 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:September 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order]
    Date Published:September 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
    Date Published:September 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Receipt (OTC auto)]
    Date Published:September 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Copy of Declaration Regarding Electronic Filing (Local Form 2)]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Copy of Declaration Regarding Electronic Filing (Local Form 2)]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Expediting Hearing]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Extend Time to File Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Expediting Hearing]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Extend Time to File Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Statement of Social Security Number]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Statement of Social Security Number]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.lamb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?68458
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 3 =