open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Louisiana

LOUISIANA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Louisiana
    Case Number:20-30848
    Party Name:Ivan Venson Alexander
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Conine, John Clifton [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
    Date Published:September 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Conine, John Clifton [Appearance and Request Notice]
    Date Published:September 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Conine, John Clifton [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:September 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Conine, John Clifton [Autodocket US Treasury Receipt]
    Date Published:September 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Conine, John Clifton [First Meeting of Creditors and Discharge Issuance Set - Chapter 7]
    Date Published:September 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Conine, John Clifton [Employee Income Records]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Conine, John Clifton [Copy of Social Security Card - Photo ID]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Conine, John Clifton [Declaration Re Electronic Filing - Statement of SSN (Rule 1007)]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Conine, John Clifton [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Fee)]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Conine, John Clifton [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.lawb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?347792
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 2 =