open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Louisiana

LOUISIANA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Louisiana
    Case Number:2:20-cr-00094-1
    Party Name:USA v. Perrilloux
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention ]
    Date Published:October 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing ]
    Date Published:October 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:October 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Pretrial Bail Report]
    Date Published:October 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:October 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
    Date Published:October 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Public Defender]
    Date Published:October 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:October 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
    Date Published:October 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Unseal Case]
    Date Published:October 16, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.laed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?247251
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 2 =