U.S. District Court for the Western District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-mc-00032
  • Case Name: Overseas Hardwoods Co Inc v. Ogilvie et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 14, 2021: [Response (NOT Motions)]
  • July 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Release of Funds]
  • July 02, 2021: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Release of Funds]
  • June 25, 2021: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
  • June 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 18, 2021: [Certificate of Service]
  • June 18, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 18, 2021: [Affidavit of Service]
  • June 04, 2021: [Writ Issued]
  • June 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Garnishment]
  • June 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ]
  • June 02, 2021: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • June 01, 2021: [Writ of Garnishment]
  • June 01, 2021: [Writ]
  • June 01, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2021
  • May 21, 2021: [Electronic Payment of Miscellaneous Case Filing Fee]
  • May 20, 2021: [Registration of Foreign Judgment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.