U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-00056-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Alexander
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 03, 2021: [Continue]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Order]
  • May 28, 2021: [Order of Detention ]
  • May 28, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • May 26, 2021: [Pretrial Bail Report]
  • May 25, 2021: [In Chambers Conference ]
  • May 25, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 24, 2021: [Pretrial Bail Report]
  • May 21, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 21, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 21, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 21, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.