U.S. District Court for the Western District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-mc-00033
  • Case Name: Overseas Hardwoods Co Inc v. Hogan Architectural Wood Products L L C et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 10, 2021: [Registry Disbursement Completed]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Receipt of Funds]
  • July 19, 2021: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
  • July 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Release of Funds]
  • July 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Garnishment]
  • July 08, 2021: [Release of Funds]
  • July 06, 2021: [Writ of Garnishment]
  • July 02, 2021: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
  • July 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Release of Funds]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Release of Funds]
  • June 25, 2021: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
  • June 18, 2021: [Certificate of Service]
  • June 18, 2021: [Affidavit of Service]
  • June 04, 2021: [Writ Issued]
  • June 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Garnishment]
  • June 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ]
  • June 02, 2021: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • June 01, 2021: [Writ of Garnishment]
  • June 01, 2021: [Writ]
  • June 01, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2021
  • May 21, 2021: [Electronic Payment of Miscellaneous Case Filing Fee]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.