U.S. District Court for the Western District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-po-00509-1
  • Case Name: USA vs Mckenzie
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [Disposition of Count (Updates CVB if PE/TE disp)]
  • October 18, 2021: [Final Payment Received (Updates CVB if PE/TE disp)]
September, 2021
  • September 13, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • September 13, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • September 13, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
August, 2021
  • August 09, 2021: [Scheduling Order (Lake Charles)]
  • August 09, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 09, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • August 09, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 04, 2021: [Waiver of Counsel]
June, 2021
  • June 11, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 09, 2021: [Payment Rescheduled (Multiple Citations)]
  • June 09, 2021: [Update CVB Disposition Information (Single Citation)]
  • June 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • June 09, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 09, 2021: [Plea and Sentence]
  • June 09, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 09, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • June 08, 2021: [Waiver of Counsel]
May, 2021
  • May 21, 2021: [Set Hearings (Updates CVB)]
  • May 21, 2021: [Citation Issued (Updates CVB)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.