U.S. District Court for the Western District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-po-00505-1
  • Case Name: USA vs Lugotescaritt
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 15, 2021: [Final Payment Received (Updates CVB if PE/TE disp)]
  • July 14, 2021: [Disposition of Count (Updates CVB if PE/TE disp)]
  • July 13, 2021: [Bench Trial - Begun]
  • July 13, 2021: [Bench Trial - Completed]
  • July 13, 2021: [Witness List (Sealed Pleading)]
June, 2021
  • June 11, 2021: [Scheduling Order (Lake Charles)]
  • June 11, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 11, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 11, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • June 11, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 11, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 08, 2021: [Waiver of Counsel]
May, 2021
  • May 21, 2021: [Citation Issued (Updates CVB)]
  • May 21, 2021: [Set Hearings (Updates CVB)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.