U.S. District Court for the Western District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-po-00499-1
  • Case Name: USA vs Joyce
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [Final Payment Received (Updates CVB if PE/TE disp)]
  • October 07, 2021: [Disposition of Count (Updates CVB if PE/TE disp)]
  • October 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • October 07, 2021: [Plea and Sentence]
  • October 07, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • October 06, 2021: [Waiver of Counsel]
June, 2021
  • June 15, 2021: [Update CVB Disposition Information (Single Citation)]
  • June 15, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
May, 2021
  • May 21, 2021: [Citation Issued (Updates CVB)]
  • May 21, 2021: [Set Hearings (Updates CVB)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.