U.S. District Court for the Western District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-po-00498-1
  • Case Name: USA vs Huddleston
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 09, 2021: [Final Payment Received (Updates CVB if PE/TE disp)]
June, 2021
  • June 15, 2021: [Payment Rescheduled (Multiple Citations)]
  • June 15, 2021: [Disposition of Count (Updates CVB if PE/TE disp)]
  • June 08, 2021: [Waiver of Counsel]
May, 2021
  • May 30, 2021: [Forfeiture of Collateral]
  • May 21, 2021: [Set Hearings (Updates CVB)]
  • May 21, 2021: [Citation Issued (Updates CVB)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.