U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-00060-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bailey
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 04, 2021: [Request for Subpoenas]
July, 2021
  • July 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 14, 2021: [Continue]
June, 2021
  • June 22, 2021: [Order of Detention ]
  • June 22, 2021: [Order]
  • June 22, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • June 22, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 15, 2021: [Continue]
  • June 14, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 14, 2021: [In Chambers Conference ]
  • June 14, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 11, 2021: [Pretrial Bail Report]
  • June 11, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 11, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 11, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 03, 2021: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.