U.S. District Court for the Western District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-mc-00034
  • Case Name: De Leon et al v. Northern Natural Gas Co
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [District Transfer/Remand Record Received]
  • August 30, 2021: [District Transfer Out (Form Included Only If Manual Attachment Exists)]
  • August 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Transfer Case]
  • August 04, 2021: [Exhibit]
  • August 03, 2021: [Response to Motion]
July, 2021
  • July 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • July 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • July 20, 2021: [Minute Entry]
  • July 20, 2021: [Transfer Case]
  • July 15, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • July 15, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: [Notice of Motion Setting]
  • June 15, 2021: [Quash]
  • June 07, 2021: [Corrective Document]
  • June 04, 2021: [Notice of Motion Setting]
  • June 01, 2021: [Proposed Order/Judgment]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Notice of Deficiency]
  • May 28, 2021: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • May 27, 2021: [Electronic Payment of Miscellaneous Case Filing Fee]
  • May 27, 2021: [Quash]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.