U.S. District Court for the Western District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-00085-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Fontenot
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 17, 2021: [Order]
  • June 08, 2021: [Remark (Public)]
  • June 07, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 07, 2021: [Bond]
  • June 07, 2021: [Witness List (Sealed Pleading)]
  • June 07, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 04, 2021: [Witness List (Sealed Pleading)]
  • June 04, 2021: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • June 04, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 04, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 01, 2021: [Order Regarding Due Process Protections Act]
  • June 01, 2021: [Order]
  • June 01, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • June 01, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 01, 2021: [Unseal Complaint]
  • June 01, 2021: [Minute Entry]
  • June 01, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.