U.S. District Court for the Western District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-mc-00044
  • Case Name: Shelton v. Senff et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Joint or Voluntary]
  • July 06, 2021: [Dismiss/Joint or Voluntary]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Memorandum Order]
  • June 30, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • June 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 23, 2021: [Jurisdictional Review Finding]
  • June 23, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 21, 2021: [Electronic Payment of Miscellaneous Case Filing Fee]
  • June 21, 2021: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • June 18, 2021: [Petition to Perpetuate Testimony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.