U.S. District Court for the Western District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-po-00611-1
  • Case Name: USA vs Tulacuamani
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 16, 2021: [Add Disposition Text]
September, 2021
  • September 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 08, 2021: [Continue]
July, 2021
  • July 20, 2021: [Discovery]
  • July 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • July 16, 2021: [Scheduling Order (Lake Charles)]
  • July 13, 2021: [Discovery]
  • July 13, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 08, 2021: [Order to Continue]
  • July 08, 2021: [Terminate Hearings]
  • July 02, 2021: [Enroll Counsel]
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: [Order on Motion to Enroll Counsel]
  • June 23, 2021: [Enroll Counsel]
  • June 21, 2021: [Citation Issued (Updates CVB)]
  • June 21, 2021: [Set Hearings (Updates CVB)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.