U.S. District Court for the Western District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-po-00600-1
  • Case Name: USA vs Pierce
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 12, 2021: [Mail Returned]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Disposition of Count (Updates CVB if PE/TE disp)]
  • September 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 27, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 27, 2021: [Dismiss]
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed (Applicable Party Document)]
  • July 21, 2021: [Summons Issued (Sealed Pleading)]
  • July 21, 2021: [Update CVB Disposition Information (Single Citation)]
  • July 08, 2021: [Forfeiture of Collateral]
June, 2021
  • June 21, 2021: [Set Hearings (Updates CVB)]
  • June 21, 2021: [Citation Issued (Updates CVB)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.