U.S. District Court for the Western District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-po-00549-1
  • Case Name: USA vs Aubrey
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Mail Returned]
December, 2021
  • December 17, 2021: [Final Payment Received (Updates CVB if PE/TE disp)]
  • December 09, 2021: [Disposition of Count (Updates CVB if PE/TE disp)]
  • December 08, 2021: [Payment Rescheduled (Multiple Citations)]
  • December 08, 2021: [Mail Returned]
November, 2021
  • November 10, 2021: [Witness List (Sealed Pleading)]
  • November 10, 2021: [Bench Trial - Begun]
  • November 10, 2021: [Bench Trial - Completed]
September, 2021
  • September 13, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • September 13, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2021
  • July 16, 2021: [Scheduling Order (Lake Charles)]
  • July 13, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 08, 2021: [Waiver of Counsel]
  • July 08, 2021: [Order to Continue]
  • July 08, 2021: [Terminate Hearings]
June, 2021
  • June 21, 2021: [Citation Issued (Updates CVB)]
  • June 21, 2021: [Set Hearings (Updates CVB)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.