U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-mj-00063-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sagastume-Fernandez
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 13, 2022: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
December, 2021
  • December 08, 2021: [Notice to Counsel - General Order 2019-04]
  • December 07, 2021: [Judgment]
  • December 01, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 01, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • December 01, 2021: [Sentencing]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Telephone Conference]
  • October 26, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 25, 2021: [Order]
  • October 25, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2021
  • June 22, 2021: [Order Appointing CJA Panel Attorney]
  • June 22, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 22, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Rule 5(c)(3) ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.