U.S. District Court for the Western District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-mj-00098-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Walker
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Enroll Counsel]
  • July 13, 2021: [Enroll Counsel]
  • July 02, 2021: [Order of Detention]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Witness List (Sealed Pleading)]
  • June 30, 2021: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • June 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • June 30, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 30, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 24, 2021: [Order Regarding Due Process Protections Act]
  • June 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • June 24, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • June 24, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 24, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 24, 2021: [Detention]
  • June 24, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 24, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed (Applicable Party Document - USA ONLY)]
  • June 24, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.