U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-00073-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Toefield
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 06, 2021: [Order of Removal to Another District]
  • July 06, 2021: [Order of Detention ]
  • July 06, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • July 01, 2021: [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
  • July 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 01, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 01, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Continue]
  • June 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record]
  • June 29, 2021: [Enroll as Counsel of Record]
  • June 29, 2021: [Return of Service (Non Summons/Warrant/Writ)]
  • June 25, 2021: [Order for Medical Examination]
  • June 25, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.