U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-00078-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cespedes
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 08, 2021: [Continue]
  • July 06, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • July 06, 2021: [Bond Set & Executed]
  • July 06, 2021: [Order]
  • July 06, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • July 06, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 02, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 02, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 02, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 02, 2021: [Pretrial Bail Report]
  • July 01, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.